Cases for Silver, Steven A in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Silver, Steven A"

Filed

Nov 30, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Sep 16, 2010

Status

Closed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Tracy Branch

Filed

Jun 15, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Aug 31, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Tracy Branch

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Business tort/ unfair business practice

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Apr 29, 2010

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Small Claims

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jul 06, 2009

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 29, 2010

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

May 05, 2008

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Sep 05, 2008

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Other Collections

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Mar 17, 2011

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

Judge

Hon. McNatt, Bob

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Mar 29, 2010

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Mar 03, 2010

Status

Closed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Feb 01, 2011

Status

Pending

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

May 17, 2010

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Type

Limited Civil Other Collections

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION,

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Lodi Branch

Filed

Aug 11, 2008

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jul 31, 1995

Status

Summary Judgment 06/12/1997

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. MASTER CALENDAR

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

Filed

Jun 16, 2008

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 30, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Other Collections

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

1 File
Filed

Sep 15, 2008

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Jan 25, 2011

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope