Cases for Silva, Jose in Texas

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Silva, Jose"

Filed

Sep 03, 2010

Status

Inactive: Disposed

Type

AG - Support

County

Denton County, TX

Court

393rd Judicial District Court

Filed

Dec 20, 2005

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Anderson, Kathleen C.

Filed

Dec 15, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Collin County, TX

Judge

Hon. Martinez, George

Filed

Sep 23, 2010

Status

Inactive: Disposed

Type

Divorce with Children

County

Denton County, TX

Court

393rd Judicial District Court

Filed

Oct 08, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Nueces County, TX

31 Files
Filed

Jan 16, 2018

Status

Inactive: Disposed

Type

Divorce with Children

County

Denton County, TX

Court

393rd Judicial District Court

Filed

Nov 15, 2006

Status

Inactive: Disposed

Type

Other Family

Judge

Hon. Associate, Judge Party(Silva, JoseJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 DENIED ORDER DENYING CONFIRMATION OF NON-AGREED CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER FINAL-NON-JURY

County

Denton County, TX

Court

16th Judicial District Court

10 Files
Filed

Jun 07, 2021

Status

Disposed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

Judge

Hon. Flores, Bobby

Filed

Nov 13, 2006

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Salas-Mendoza, Maria Converted Disposition:Party: M.D. SILVA, JOSE J. Disposition: DISMISSAL

Filed

Jan 08, 2009

Status

Inactive: Disposed

Type

Tax Suit

Judge

Hon. Collier, Jake

County

Denton County, TX

Court

158th Judicial District Court

Filed

Aug 30, 2016

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Leverton, Reed

4 Files
Filed

Apr 12, 2016

Status

Disposed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

Judge

Hon. Lopez, Letty

Filed

Aug 28, 2019

County

Cameron County, TX

Judge

Hon. Rosas, Gilberto

10 Files
Filed

Jan 12, 2018

Status

Filed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

14 Files
Filed

Oct 11, 2012

Status

Disposed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

Judge

Hon. Palacios, Jaime J.

Filed

Jun 14, 2010

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SILVA, JOSE A Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT

Filed

Feb 08, 2006

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Bramblett, Mary Anne Converted Disposition:Party: SILVA, JOSE B Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT

Filed

Dec 03, 2009

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Gutierrez, Yahara L. Converted Disposition:Party: SILVA, JOSE JESUS Disposition: ORDER DENYING

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope