Cases for Shields, Colleen D in Delaware

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Shields, Colleen D"

Filed

Mar 18, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Mar 08, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Jan 15, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. SCOTT JR, CALVIN L

Filed

Jan 09, 2015

Status

NEW

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

Oct 02, 2017

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

Oct 20, 2011

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

Jun 12, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

MALPRACTICE

County

Kent County, DE

Judge

Hon. CLARK, JEFFREY J

Filed

Feb 19, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. COOCH, RICHARD R

Filed

Sep 26, 2017

Status

CLOSED

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

1 File
Filed

Jul 26, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

CCLD: COMPLEX COM LIT DIVISION

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JOHNSTON, MARY M

Filed

Jan 16, 2020

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PRODUCTS LIABILITY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. WHARTON, FERRIS W

Filed

Feb 14, 2020

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. LEGROW, ABIGAIL M

Filed

Mar 19, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. RENNIE, SHELDON K

Filed

Aug 09, 2017

Status

CLOSED

Type

MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. COOCH, RICHARD R

Filed

Jun 28, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JONES JR, FRANCIS J

Filed

Nov 15, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. LEGROW, ABIGAIL M

Filed

Aug 04, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. PARKINS JR., JOHN A

Filed

Aug 07, 2019

Status

NEW

Type

MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JONES JR, FRANCIS J

Filed

May 31, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

Jul 25, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JURDEN, JAN R

Filed

May 31, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

May 31, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

May 31, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

May 31, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

Filed

May 31, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope