Cases for Sheila Robinson in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Sheila Robinson"

Filed

Sep 11, 2020

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Jul 16, 2020

Status

Dismissed -- Lack of Prosecution 10/16/2020

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Filed

Apr 05, 2018

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Nov 06, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 13, 2016

Status

JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) 03/22/2017

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Filed

Jul 29, 2016

Status

DISMISSED 11/21/2017

County

Contra Costa County, CA

22 Files
Filed

Jun 16, 2016

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)

County

Santa Clara County, CA

Court

Santa Clara

43 Files
Filed

Apr 15, 2016

Status

Active

Type

Other Real Property Unlimited (26)

County

Santa Clara County, CA

Court

Santa Clara

Filed

Jun 17, 2015

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 05/20/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jun 05, 2013

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

May 09, 2012

Status

DISMISSED 01/29/2013

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Filed

Jan 05, 2012

Status

ACTIVE

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Filed

Mar 10, 2011

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Oct 22, 2010

Status

Judgment Satisfied

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jun 09, 2010

Status

ACTIVE

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Filed

Oct 01, 2009

Status

DISMISS W/O PREJ. 08/04/2011

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Filed

Mar 27, 2009

Status

Disposed

Type

Small Claims

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Oct 02, 2008

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other Real Property Unlimited (26)

County

Santa Clara County, CA

Court

Santa Clara

Filed

Sep 30, 2008

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 03, 2008

Type

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION WITHOUT CHILDREN

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

May 09, 2008

Status

DISMISS W/O PREJ. 12/11/2008

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Closed

Type

Unlimited Civil Construction Defect (Complex Litigation)

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

All Proceedings Stayed

Type

Unlimited Civil Construction Defect (Complex Litigation)

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jan 24, 2008

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 02, 2003

Status

DISMISS W/O PREJ. 02/21/2006

County

Contra Costa County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope