Cases for Settlement Funding Llc in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Settlement Funding Llc"

1 File
Filed

Jul 13, 2006

Status

CLOSED

Type

16 - OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL

County

Seminole County, FL

Judge

Hon. MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

2 Files
Filed

Dec 21, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

2 Files
Filed

Jul 14, 2021

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

7 Files
Filed

Apr 25, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

OTHER CIVIL-BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

County

Marion County, FL

Judge

Hon. ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

2 Files
Filed

Apr 30, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

8 Files
Filed

Feb 07, 2006

Status

CLOSED

Type

16 - OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL

County

Seminole County, FL

Judge

Hon. NANCY F. ALLEY

1 File
Filed

Dec 14, 2011

Status

CLOSED

County

Duval County, FL

Court

Circuit Civil

1 File
Filed

Oct 15, 2021

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

19 Files
Filed

Apr 12, 2021

Status

Closed

Type

CONTRACT & DEBT

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Nov 20, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

4 Files
Filed

May 06, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. SMITH, R. LEE

Filed

Jun 04, 2014

Status

CLOSED

Type

Business Transactions

County

Charlotte County, FL

Judge

Hon. PORTER, LISA S

7 Files
Filed

Feb 22, 2021

Status

CLOSED

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. MALTZ, HOWARD M.

1 File
Filed

May 06, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

OTHER CIVIL-BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

County

Marion County, FL

1 File
Filed

Nov 13, 2017

Status

CLOSED

Type

OTHER CIVIL-BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

County

Marion County, FL

1 File
Filed

Aug 09, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

OTHER CIVIL-BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

County

Marion County, FL

5 Files
Filed

Feb 09, 2010

Status

Closed

Type

CONTRACT & DEBT

County

Palm Beach County, FL

1 File
Filed

May 05, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

38 Files
Filed

Sep 05, 2012

Status

Closed

Type

CONTRACT & DEBT

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

May 05, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Other

Judge

Hon. 04 Perlman, Sandra

County

Broward County, FL

Court

Central Courthouse

Filed

Aug 09, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Other

County

Broward County, FL

Judge

Hon. 13 Robinson, Michael A.

5 Files
Filed

Aug 09, 2011

Status

Closed

Type

TRADE SECRET

County

Palm Beach County, FL

1 File
Filed

Oct 13, 2017

Status

CLOSED

Type

OTHER CIVIL-BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

County

Marion County, FL

4 Files
Filed

May 20, 2014

Status

Closed

Type

OTHER CIRCUIT

County

Palm Beach County, FL

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope