Cases for Seliger, Esq., Brooke in Massachusetts

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Seliger, Esq., Brooke"

25 Files
Filed

Sep 06, 2017

Status

09/06/2017

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Judge

Hon. Kenton-Walker, Janet

Filed

Aug 17, 2017

Status

08/17/2017

Type

Personal Injury - Slip & Fall

County

Worcester County, MA

6 Files
Filed

Jan 27, 2016

Status

01/27/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

11 Files
Filed

Nov 28, 2016

Status

02/02/2017

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Franklin County, MA

16 Files
Filed

Jun 05, 2015

Status

06/05/2015

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Judge

Hon. Mulqueen, Jane E

2 Files
Filed

Aug 19, 2015

Status

06/29/2016

Type

Other Contract Action

County

Hampden County, MA

Filed

Oct 30, 2013

Status

10/30/2013

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

6 Files
Filed

Dec 11, 2014

Status

12/11/2014

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Bristol County, MA

7 Files
Filed

Apr 23, 2014

Status

04/23/2014

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

44 Files
Filed

Oct 06, 2016

Status

10/06/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Judge

Hon. Donatelle, Sharon

Filed

Apr 28, 2014

Status

12/03/2015

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Berkshire County, MA

15 Files
Filed

Oct 11, 2016

Status

10/11/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Bristol County, MA

8 Files
Filed

Oct 06, 2017

Status

07/26/2018

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Berkshire County, MA

Judge

Hon. Agostini, John A

Filed

Jan 09, 2014

Status

01/09/2014

Type

Personal Injury - Slip & Fall

County

Hampden County, MA

2 Files
Filed

Dec 28, 2012

Status

12/28/2012

Type

Products Liability

County

Worcester County, MA

3 Files
Filed

Jun 17, 2014

Status

06/17/2014

Type

Other Tortious Action

County

Worcester County, MA

4 Files
Filed

Jun 30, 2014

Status

06/30/2014

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Judge

Hon. Kenton-Walker, Janet

Filed

Oct 07, 2011

Status

10/07/2011

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Filed

Feb 12, 2008

Status

02/12/2008

Type

Other Tortious Action

County

Worcester County, MA

Filed

Dec 22, 2006

Status

12/22/2006

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Filed

Apr 02, 2010

Status

04/02/2010

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Filed

Jul 05, 2005

Status

07/05/2005

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Hampden County, MA

Filed

Jul 12, 2007

Status

07/12/2007

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

Filed

Jul 17, 2007

Status

07/17/2007

Type

Wrongful Death - Non-medical, G.L.c.229, §2A

County

Worcester County, MA

4 Files
Filed

May 29, 2015

Status

05/29/2015

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Bristol County, MA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope