Cases for Rick Dalan in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Rick Dalan"

Filed

Mar 16, 2018

Status

Closed

Type

Premises Liability-Commercial

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Huey, L. Paul

36 Files
Filed

Mar 16, 2018

Status

Closed

Type

Premises Liability-Commercial

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Huey, Paul. L

2 Files
Filed

Jul 11, 2019

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

May 23, 2014

Status

Closed

Type

Premises Liability-Commercial

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Levens, P. William

8 Files
Filed

Nov 02, 2017

Status

CLOSED

County

Manatee County, FL

Judge

Hon. CHARLES SNIFFEN

Filed

May 13, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE

County

Hernando County, FL

1 File
Filed

Sep 09, 2015

Status

CLOSED

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE

County

Hernando County, FL

Filed

Jun 22, 2006

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Cook, J.. Martha

Filed

Aug 07, 2015

Status

CLOSED

Type

PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL

County

Hernando County, FL

1 File
Filed

May 23, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL

County

Hernando County, FL

Filed

Feb 16, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Cook, J.. Martha

Filed

Sep 01, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE

County

Hernando County, FL

Filed

Feb 07, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Other Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Cook, J.. Martha

15 Files
Filed

Feb 05, 2007

Status

CLOSED

County

Manatee County, FL

Judge

Hon. JANETTE DUNNIGAN

Filed

Aug 12, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE

County

Hernando County, FL

Filed

Jun 11, 2007

Status

Closed

Type

Other Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Bergmann, E. Charles

3 Files
Filed

Dec 24, 2008

Status

Met Retention

Type

CA Damages Negligence

County

Lee County, FL

24 Files
Filed

Aug 26, 2019

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

150 Files
Filed

Nov 13, 2013

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. MCHUGH, ANDREA

Filed

Apr 16, 2008

Status

Closed

Type

Other Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Levens, P. William

Filed

Aug 20, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

OTHER NEGLIGENCE

County

Hernando County, FL

Filed

May 01, 2003

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

6 Files
Filed

Sep 05, 2019

Type

INSURANCE CLAIMS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MEYER, KEITH

Filed

Oct 23, 2009

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. BAIRD, W DOUGLAS

Filed

Nov 04, 2008

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope