Cases for Rebecca S Sinclair in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Rebecca S Sinclair"

Filed

Apr 01, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Barton, M. James

Filed

Apr 06, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Arnold, D. James

4 Files
Filed

Mar 04, 2005

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. COUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 2

Filed

Mar 08, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Cook, J.. Martha

Filed

Mar 04, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Barton, M. James

6 Files
Filed

Apr 06, 2005

Status

CLOSED

County

Manatee County, FL

Judge

Hon. DURAND JAMES ADAMS

Filed

Jul 21, 2005

Type

SMALL CLAIMS

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

Jul 14, 2005

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. VACCARO, DOROTHY

Filed

Feb 11, 2005

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. VACCARO, DOROTHY

Filed

Feb 07, 2005

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR

Filed

Jun 24, 2005

Type

SMALL CLAIMS

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. VACCARO, DOROTHY

Filed

Jul 28, 2009

Status

CLOSED

County

Seminole County, FL

Judge

Hon. NANCY F. ALLEY

Filed

Feb 25, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Levens, P. William

Filed

Jan 19, 2005

Type

SMALL CLAIMS

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

May 10, 2010

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Mar 07, 2005

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. BOYER, BRUCE

Filed

Jan 03, 2005

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

Oct 30, 2008

County

Volusia County, FL

24 Files
Filed

Mar 25, 2010

Status

Reclosed Case

Type

Real Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000

Judge

Hon. 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

County

Broward County, FL

Court

Central Courthouse

Filed

Feb 14, 2005

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III

Filed

Sep 20, 2005

Type

SMALL CLAIMS

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

Sep 20, 2005

Type

SMALL CLAIMS

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

Aug 08, 2005

Type

SMALL CLAIMS

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. VACCARO, DOROTHY

Filed

Oct 06, 2005

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

Sep 21, 2005

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope