Cases for Ramon, Mark in Texas

trellis logo loading

1-6 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Ramon, Mark"

4 Files
Filed

May 07, 2019

Status

Inactive: Disposed

Type

Debt/Contract: Debt/Contract

County

Denton County, TX

Court

462nd Judicial District Court

Filed

Feb 20, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

Filed

Aug 11, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Gonzales Ramos, Nelva

Filed

Aug 31, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Gonzales Ramos, Nelva

Filed

Dec 14, 2016

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Stith, David

Filed

Aug 03, 2007

Status

CLOSED

County

Dallas County, TX

Court

95th District Court

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope