Cases for QUEVEDO ALBERT in California

Filed

Jul 29, 2019

Status

Statistical Disposition 09/09/2019

Type

Civil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Charles Q. Clay III Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Charles Q. Clay III

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Whittier

14 Files
Filed

May 10, 2021

Status

Deemed Complete (No Remand from Federal Court) 10/06/2021

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Yolanda Orozco Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Yolanda Orozco

Filed

Mar 05, 2019

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 10/28/2019

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Yolanda Orozco Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Yolanda Orozco

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +