Cases for Pakiz J Derek Esq. in California

Filed

Jan 13, 2010

Status

Statistical Disposition 02/11/2010

Type

Minor's Compromise (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Thomas C. Falls Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Thomas C. Falls

Filed

Jan 14, 2008

Status

Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. 04/22/2009

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Jane Johnson Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Jane Johnson

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

Filed

Mar 24, 2009

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 04/15/2009

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Dec 09, 2009

Status

Dismissed - Other 01/27/2010

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Ronald M. Sohigian Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Ronald M. Sohigian

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 18, 2002

Status

Dismissed - Other 07/30/2003

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Lee Smalley Edmon Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lee Smalley Edmon

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Aug 25, 2011

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/08/2011

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Richard L. Fruin Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Richard L. Fruin

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jan 03, 2003

Status

Dismissed - Other 08/04/2003

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. David A. Workman Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David A. Workman

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Feb 27, 2003

Status

Dismissed - Other 12/22/2003

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Mary Thornton House Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Mary Thornton House

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 08, 2003

Status

Dismissed - Other 04/08/2004

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jun 02, 2017

Status

Pending

Type

Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. David Sotelo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David Sotelo

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 07, 2009

Status

Dismissed - Other 01/12/2010

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. David L. Minning Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David L. Minning

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 05, 2002

Status

Dismissed - Other 10/03/2003

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Alan G. Buckner Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Alan G. Buckner

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 25, 2015

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/21/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Yolanda Orozco Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Yolanda Orozco

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 16, 2010

Status

LEGACY DISPOSITION TYPE 02/09/2011

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 05, 2002

Status

Dismissed - Other 08/14/2003

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 03, 2002

Status

Dismissed - Other 07/09/2003

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Helen I. Bendix Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Helen I. Bendix

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jun 06, 2000

Status

Dismissed - Other 02/02/2001

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. ELIHU M. BERLE Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for ELIHU M. BERLE

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

May 23, 2011

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/04/2012

Type

Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Ruth Ann Kwan Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Ruth Ann Kwan

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 18, 2005

Status

Dismissed - Other 10/02/2006

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Meeka, Peter J. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Meeka, Peter J.

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Pomona Courthouse South

Filed

Jun 28, 2002

Status

Dismissed - Other 05/23/2003

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Mary Ann Murphy Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Mary Ann Murphy

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 20, 2005

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/06/2006

Type

Product Liability (not asbestos or toxic/environmental) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Helen I. Bendix Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Helen I. Bendix

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 17, 2001

Status

Dismissed - Other 11/01/2002

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Irving Feffer Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Irving Feffer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jan 29, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/30/2016

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Holly J. Fujie Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Holly J. Fujie

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Apr 29, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/15/2016

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Benny C. Osorio Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Benny C. Osorio

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Apr 28, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Audra M. Mori Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Audra M. Mori

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +