Cases for Murphy, Dawn in Delaware

trellis logo loading

1-6 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Murphy, Dawn"

Filed

Dec 20, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

MORTGAGE MEDIATION

County

Sussex County, DE

Judge

Hon. BRADLEY, E. SCOTT

Filed

Jan 08, 2021

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Aug 08, 2018

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Oct 25, 2019

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

May 24, 2018

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Dec 29, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

PELVIC MESH

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. JUDGE, PELVIC MESH

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope