Cases for Millon, Andres in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets
26 Files
Filed

May 06, 2021

Status

OPEN

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

7 Files
Filed

Feb 19, 2021

Status

CLOSED

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

25 Files
Filed

Mar 09, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

53 Files
Filed

Nov 08, 2018

Status

PJREPACT

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

99 Files
Filed

Dec 04, 2018

Status

OPEN

Type

Comm Premises Liability

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

29 Files
Filed

Mar 05, 2021

Status

OPEN

Type

Comm Premises Liability

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

42 Files
Filed

Oct 20, 2020

Status

OPEN

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

135 Files
Filed

May 09, 2019

Status

OPEN

Type

Other Civil Complaint

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

16 Files
Filed

Aug 09, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

Other Negligence

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

136 Files
Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

OPEN

Type

BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS

County

St. Lucie County, FL

Judge

Hon. BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

118 Files
Filed

Jan 27, 2021

Status

OPEN

Type

Other Negligence

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

164 Files
Filed

Nov 29, 2018

Status

OPEN

Type

Replevin

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

14 Files
Filed

Dec 19, 2019

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract and Indebtedness

Judge

Hon. 03 Lopane, Nicholas

County

Broward County, FL

Court

Central Courthouse

1 File
Filed

Sep 10, 2019

Status

OPEN

County

Martin County, FL

Judge

Hon. METZGER, ELIZABETH A

13 Files
Filed

Aug 25, 2020

Status

OPEN

County

Bay County, FL

Judge

Hon. GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

38 Files
Filed

Nov 12, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Neg - Premises Liability Commercial

County

Broward County, FL

Judge

Hon. 04 Perlman, Sandra

109 Files
Filed

Mar 26, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

Other Negligence

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

May 20, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

7 Files
Filed

Sep 17, 2021

Status

CLOSED

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

17 Files
Filed

Dec 14, 2017

Status

OPEN

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

4 Files
Filed

Sep 03, 2021

Status

OPEN

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

12 Files
Filed

Apr 04, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

7 Files
Filed

May 03, 2021

Status

CLOSED

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

4 Files
Filed

May 28, 2014

Status

CLOSED

Type

Personal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

6 Files
Filed

Jun 10, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

Injunctive Relief

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +