Cases for Melendez, Desiree in California

trellis logo loading

1-8 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Melendez, Desiree"

Filed

Apr 27, 2007

Status

Closed

County

San Bernardino County, CA

9 Files
Filed

Mar 06, 2020

Status

Judgment Entered

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

Filed

May 24, 1989

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Filed

Jun 12, 2007

Status

Judgment Entered

County

San Bernardino County, CA

6 Files
Filed

Oct 26, 2021

Status

Active

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

11 Files
Filed

Apr 02, 2021

Status

Judgment Entered

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

Filed

Jul 27, 2010

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

4 Files
Filed

Feb 22, 2022

Status

Active

Type

Auto PI/PD/WD Unlimited

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope