Cases for Mcginn, James Raymond in New York

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Nov 10, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

1 File
Filed

Aug 19, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Feb 06, 2020

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Workers Comp App for Judgment

County

Ontario County, NY

Court

Ontario County Supreme Court

1 File
Filed

Aug 26, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

1 File
Filed

Aug 26, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jun 23, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Jun 17, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

1 File
Filed

Aug 05, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

1 File
Filed

Mar 04, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jun 23, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Ontario County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Jan 21, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Nov 11, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Apr 08, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

May 13, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

May 20, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jan 28, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Nov 04, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Albany County, NY

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +