Cases for Margaret Fischer in Florida

Filed

Apr 27, 2015

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Feb 14, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Hernando County, FL

Judge

Hon. VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

Filed

Jul 17, 2007

Status

Closed

Type

SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION =>$1000

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Mar 18, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

TRUST

County

Palm Beach County, FL

10 Files
Filed

Oct 27, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

CA Mortgage Foreclosure

County

Lee County, FL

Judge

Hon. Joseph C Fuller Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Joseph C Fuller

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +