Cases for Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc"

Filed

Jul 10, 2013

Type

OTHER CIVIL - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MINKOFF, THOMAS H

Filed

Mar 10, 2014

Type

NEGLIGENCE - PREMISES LIABILITY - COMMERCIAL

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. DAY, JACK

Filed

Jul 02, 2009

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. ANDRINGA, HENRY J

Filed

Sep 07, 2007

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McGRADY, J THOMAS

Filed

Nov 04, 2008

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

4 Files
Filed

Mar 28, 2005

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

Filed

Jan 04, 2008

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T

Filed

Jul 02, 2009

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T

Filed

Oct 27, 2010

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T

Filed

Nov 03, 2009

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

Filed

Jul 02, 2009

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

Filed

Nov 03, 2009

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JAGGER, EDWIN

Filed

Jul 02, 2009

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T

Filed

Jun 20, 2005

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. ANDRINGA, HENRY J

Filed

May 21, 2008

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

Filed

Jan 07, 2010

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T

Filed

Dec 02, 2008

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

Filed

Mar 03, 2011

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T

Filed

Jun 30, 2006

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. ANDRINGA, HENRY J

Filed

Jul 03, 2007

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JAGGER, EDWIN

Filed

Jul 03, 2007

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. KELLY, LORRAINE

Filed

Jan 04, 2007

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JAGGER, EDWIN

Filed

Feb 28, 2006

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

Filed

Dec 31, 2009

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JAGGER, EDWIN

Filed

Dec 23, 2010

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. FULLERTON, WALTER

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope