Cases for Lawson, James R. in California

trellis logo loading

1-5 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Lawson, James R."

Filed

Jun 04, 2001

Status

Dismissed - Binding Arbitration 01/14/2002

Type

Other Contract (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Apr 20, 2006

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

1 File
Filed

Apr 13, 2020

Status

Active

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Jun 13, 1994

Status

Closed

County

Yuba County, CA

Filed

Apr 14, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge, Assigned

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope