Cases for Johnson, Shelley M. in California

trellis logo loading

1-4 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Johnson, Shelley M."

Filed

Jan 03, 2014

Status

Statistical Disposition 07/28/2016

Type

Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Steven D.

Filed

May 08, 2013

Status

Court Supervision Terminated 09/06/2019

Type

Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Brenda J.

Filed

Aug 02, 2010

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 18, 2005

Type

Misc Complaints - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope