Cases for Johnson, Anthony M. in California

trellis logo loading

1-8 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
Filed

Apr 02, 2018

Status

Dismissed

Type

Other employment

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. Earl H. Maas, III Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Earl H. Maas, III

Filed

Sep 15, 2017

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Nov 09, 2011

Status

Trial Set

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Mar 18, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/20/2018

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Elaine Lu Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Elaine Lu

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Apr 23, 2015

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Aug 09, 2012

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Dec 30, 2016

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

May 02, 1995

Status

Dismissed - Other on 05/06/1996

Type

Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Madeleine I. Flier Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Madeleine I. Flier

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +