Cases for Joel P Yanchuck, Esq in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Joel P Yanchuck, Esq"

2 Files
Filed

Aug 11, 2014

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Foster, Robert. A

Filed

Aug 26, 2013

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Huey, L. Paul

Filed

Jul 26, 2005

Status

Closed

Type

Other Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Barton, M. James

Filed

Jun 01, 2011

Status

Closed

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Stephens, Scott. Steven

Filed

Oct 27, 2006

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Cook, J.. Martha

Filed

May 15, 2003

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

Filed

Feb 21, 2007

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Pendino, D. Sam

Filed

Mar 03, 2008

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McGRADY, J THOMAS

Filed

Dec 07, 2011

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. SHAMES, MARK I

Filed

Oct 25, 2006

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

Filed

Mar 09, 2009

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. WILLIAMS, AMY M

Filed

Sep 21, 2011

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. SHAMES, MARK I

Filed

Nov 09, 2005

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. WILLIAMS, AMY M

Filed

May 18, 2011

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

Filed

Sep 18, 2008

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. DEMERS, DAVID A

Filed

Oct 14, 2009

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

Filed

Dec 10, 2004

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

Filed

Feb 22, 2005

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. QUESADA, FRANK

Filed

Dec 09, 2005

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. LOGAN, WALTER D

Filed

Mar 02, 2009

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

Filed

Aug 21, 2006

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. LOGAN, WALTER D

Filed

Aug 27, 2003

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. LOGAN, WALTER D

Filed

Oct 22, 2003

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

Filed

Jul 13, 2011

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

Filed

Aug 23, 2011

Type

NEGLIGENCE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. WILLIAMS, AMY M

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope