Cases for Je Higgins Lumber Company in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Je Higgins Lumber Company"

Filed

Jan 15, 2010

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Other Collections

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Mar 25, 2010

Status

Dismissed

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Aug 24, 2012

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

May 17, 2005

Status

Dismissed - Other 10/06/2005

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Santa Monica Courthouse

Filed

Aug 26, 2011

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jul 14, 2010

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jul 14, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Filed

Mar 11, 2005

Type

Contract - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Mar 15, 2010

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Sep 26, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Aug 29, 2005

Type

Contract - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Nov 23, 2009

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Dec 14, 2006

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Oct 12, 2006

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge, No Assigned

Filed

Oct 12, 2006

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge, No Assigned

Filed

Oct 12, 2006

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge, No Assigned

Filed

Oct 14, 2010

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. deBellefeuille, Denise

Filed

Feb 02, 2009

Status

Disposition (Conversion)

County

Santa Cruz County, CA

Filed

Mar 01, 2012

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. deBellefeuille, Denise

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Business tort/ unfair business practice

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

May 03, 2010

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Aug 26, 2011

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

May 20, 1993

Status

PreSustain Disposition

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Jan 11, 2010

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope