Cases for Jackson , Scott in Ohio

trellis logo loading

1-24 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Jackson , Scott"

Filed

Oct 25, 2013

County

Portage County, OH

Judge

Hon. RAVENNA ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE

14 Files
Filed

Dec 18, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

FORCIBLE ENTRY

County

Montgomery County, OH

7 Files
Filed

Sep 05, 2012

Type

MONEY DUE

County

Summit County, OH

Judge

Hon. JOY M OLDFIELD

27 Files
Filed

Sep 24, 2007

Status

CLOSED

Type

DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN

County

Montgomery County, OH

10 Files
Filed

Feb 23, 2017

County

Summit County, OH

Judge

Hon. CHRISTINE CROCE

5 Files
Filed

Jun 17, 2015

County

Summit County, OH

Judge

Hon. CHRISTINE CROCE

17 Files
Filed

Sep 05, 2007

Status

CLOSED

Type

MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

County

Montgomery County, OH

Filed

May 15, 2015

County

Portage County, OH

Judge

Hon. RAVENNA ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE

7 Files
Filed

Aug 31, 2011

Type

FORECLOSURE

County

Summit County, OH

Judge

Hon. TODD MCKENNEY

1 File
Filed

Oct 01, 2013

Status

Closed

Type

CIVIL - GENERAL

County

Butler County, OH

Judge

Hon. ONEY, Honorable PATRICIA

4 Files
Filed

Oct 15, 2015

Type

FORECLOSURE

County

Summit County, OH

Judge

Hon. ALISON BREAUX

66 Files
Filed

May 12, 2006

Status

CLOSED

Type

MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

County

Montgomery County, OH

Filed

Mar 06, 2009

Status

Closed

Type

DOMESTIC RELATIONS

County

Butler County, OH

Judge

Hon. KENNEDY, SHARON

Filed

Sep 10, 2007

Status

Closed

Type

DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

County

Greene County, OH

Judge

Hon. HURLEY, STEVEN L

Filed

Mar 02, 2017

Status

31-AUG-91

Type

DAYTON

County

Montgomery County, OH

Filed

Jan 20, 2011

Status

Open

Type

(CJ) CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT

County

Delaware County, OH

Judge

Hon. SCHUCK, JAMES P.

Filed

Jun 28, 2007

Status

Open

Type

(CJ) CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT

County

Delaware County, OH

Judge

Hon. SCHUCK, JAMES P.

Filed

Dec 13, 2021

Status

PENDING

County

Medina County, OH

Filed

Aug 10, 2005

County

Montgomery County, OH

Filed

Oct 24, 2008

Type

Civil

County

Miami County, OH

Judge

Hon. 10/10/2017

Filed

Mar 14, 2011

Status

Closed

Type

(PES) ESTATE

County

Delaware County, OH

Judge

Hon. Spicer, Kenneth J

5 Files
Filed

May 24, 2007

County

Summit County, OH

Judge

Hon. PATRICIA A COSGROVE

Filed

Feb 03, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

FORECLOSURE

County

Wayne County, OH

Judge

Hon. WIEST, MARK K

Filed

Jan 27, 2011

Type

CIVIL

County

Miami County, OH

Judge

Hon. Lindeman, Robert J

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope