Cases for Houlihan Lawrence Inc. in New York

64 Files
Filed

Sep 02, 2022

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Hal B Greenwald Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Hal B Greenwald

29 Files
Filed

Dec 08, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. _ Cp Part, Cp Part

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

86 Files
Filed

Jul 25, 2013

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract (Non-Commercial)

Judge

Hon. David F Everett Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David F Everett

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

105 Files
Filed

Jul 14, 2011

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial

Judge

Hon. Francesca E Connolly

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

32 Files
Filed

May 30, 2013

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial

Judge

Hon. _ Trp Part, Trp Part

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

10 Files
Filed

Dec 31, 2015

Status

Disposed

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. _ Cp Part, Cp Part

10 Files
Filed

Nov 29, 2012

Status

Disposed

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Francesca E Connolly

18 Files
Filed

Oct 07, 2022

Status

Active

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Linda Jamieson Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Linda Jamieson

15 Files
Filed

Nov 12, 2014

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract (Non-Commercial)

Judge

Hon. William J Giacomo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for William J Giacomo

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

24 Files
Filed

Nov 12, 2018

Status

Disposed

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (Breach of Contract)

Judge

Hon. Lawrence Ecker Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lawrence Ecker

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

1503 Files
Filed

Jul 14, 2018

Status

Active

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Linda Jamieson Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Linda Jamieson

11 Files
Filed

Feb 24, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Westchester County, NY

11 Files
Filed

Feb 24, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Westchester County, NY

1 File
Filed

Apr 17, 2014

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Contract (Non-Commercial)

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

5 Files
Filed

Mar 23, 2017

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Commercial - Contract

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

43 Files
Filed

Jun 24, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (During purchase of home)

Judge

Hon. David F Everett Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David F Everett

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

15 Files
Filed

Nov 11, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. _ Cp Part, Cp Part

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +