Cases for Horowitz, Michael A.. in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Horowitz, Michael A.."

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. Coughlan, Michael Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Coughlan, Michael

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jan 27, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jun 01, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Oct 15, 2002

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

County

Santa Clara County, CA

Court

Santa Clara

Filed

Oct 03, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil PI/PD/WD (Other)

Judge

Hon. Coughlan, Michael Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Coughlan, Michael

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jul 21, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. Lofthus, Linda L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lofthus, Linda L.

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

6 Files
Filed

Jan 09, 2007

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Nov 26, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

17 Files
Filed

Dec 21, 2011

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

7 Files
Filed

Mar 14, 2007

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

11 Files
Filed

Jan 17, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Dec 09, 2009

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. Lofthus, Linda L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lofthus, Linda L.

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

4 Files
Filed

Nov 21, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

4 Files
Filed

Feb 25, 2005

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

4 Files
Filed

May 03, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Jun 14, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. Kronlund, Barbara Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Kronlund, Barbara

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

23 Files
Filed

Sep 15, 2020

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

19 Files
Filed

Jul 14, 2022

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Apr 08, 2011

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

7 Files
Filed

Dec 19, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

25 Files
Filed

Apr 01, 2022

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

9 Files
Filed

Sep 18, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

3 Files
Filed

May 11, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

43 Files
Filed

Mar 15, 2022

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

13 Files
Filed

Dec 17, 2004

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope