Cases for Hochberg, Shari B. in New York

5 Files
Filed

Nov 21, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Special Proceedings - Other (Disinterment)

Judge

Hon. Lawrence Ecker Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lawrence Ecker

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

28 Files
Filed

Nov 11, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Commercial Division

Judge

Hon. Gretchen Walsh Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gretchen Walsh

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

13 Files
Filed

Sep 24, 2019

Status

Disposed

Type

Special Proceedings - Mechanic's Lien

Judge

Hon. Wavny Toussaint Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Wavny Toussaint

County

Kings County, NY

Court

Kings County Supreme Court

40 Files
Filed

Jun 09, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Torts - Other Professional Malpractice (Legal Malpractice)

Judge

Hon. Lynn R Kotler Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lynn R Kotler

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

7 Files
Filed

Nov 14, 2014

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial (General)

Judge

Hon. Cynthia S Kern Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Cynthia S Kern

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

12 Files
Filed

Sep 24, 2018

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. William J Giacomo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for William J Giacomo

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

4 Files
Filed

Sep 27, 2017

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Real Property - Other (Non payment fees)

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

65 Files
Filed

Feb 03, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial Division

Judge

Hon. Gretchen Walsh Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gretchen Walsh

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

4 Files
Filed

Oct 04, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Special Proceedings - Other (CPLR 3119)

Judge

Hon. Lawrence Ecker Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lawrence Ecker

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

13 Files
Filed

Feb 25, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract (Non-Commercial)

Judge

Hon. Jerome C Murphy Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Jerome C Murphy

County

Nassau County, NY

Court

Nassau County Supreme Court

4 Files
Filed

Feb 16, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. Terry Jane Ruderman Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Terry Jane Ruderman

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

26 Files
Filed

Oct 23, 2017

Status

Disposed-Court Date/Application Pending

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. _ Cp Part, Cp Part

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

20 Files
Filed

Sep 12, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial Division

Judge

Hon. Alan Scheinkman Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Alan Scheinkman

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

116 Files
Filed

Apr 02, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract (Non-Commercial)

Judge

Hon. Susan M. Capeci Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Susan M. Capeci

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

7 Files
Filed

Jun 18, 2019

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. William J Giacomo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for William J Giacomo

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

33 Files
Filed

Mar 25, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract (Non-Commercial)

Judge

Hon. Lewis Jay Lubell Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lewis Jay Lubell

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

40 Files
Filed

Feb 02, 2016

Status

Disposed

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Charles D Wood Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Charles D Wood

1502 Files
Filed

Jul 14, 2018

Status

Active

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Linda Jamieson Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Linda Jamieson

7 Files
Filed

Sep 06, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. _ D Foreclosure Ju

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +