Cases for Hernandez, Guadalupe in Texas

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Hernandez, Guadalupe"

Filed

Aug 17, 2009

Status

Case is Closed

County

Collin County, TX

Judge

Hon. ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris

Filed

Feb 10, 2010

Status

Disposed

County

Tom Green County, TX

Filed

Oct 26, 2010

Status

Disposed

County

Guadalupe County, TX

Judge

Hon. Old III, William D

3 Files
Filed

Aug 17, 2012

Status

Disposed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

28 Files
Filed

Oct 27, 2016

Status

CLOSED

County

Dallas County, TX

Court

134th District Court

29 Files
Filed

Jul 27, 2017

Status

Disposed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

Judge

Hon. Lopez, Letty

10 Files
Filed

Jun 05, 2019

Status

Filed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

Judge

Hon. Flores, Bobby) Party(Alvarez, Jamie

Filed

Aug 11, 2008

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Stoner, Janice K.

19 Files
Filed

Oct 01, 2004

Status

Disposed

County

Hidalgo County, TX

Filed

Nov 20, 2008

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Rangel, Bonnie Converted Disposition:Party: HERNANDEZ, GUADALUPE RUEDA Disposition: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Filed

Aug 06, 2008

Status

Closed

County

El Paso County, TX

Judge

Hon. Herrera, Mike Converted Disposition:Party: HERNANDEZ, GUADALUPE Disposition: DEC OF DIVORCE

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope