Cases for Hernandez, Clarissa in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
Filed

Jun 19, 2017

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Judge

Hon. Rocky J. Baio Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Rocky J. Baio

Filed

Jan 29, 2018

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Oct 27, 2014

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Apr 10, 2013

Status

Court Supervision Terminated 04/30/2016

Type

Decedent's Estate (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Michael I.

Filed

Jul 27, 2016

Status

Dismissed

Type

Harassment

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Feb 17, 2016

County

Orange County, CA

Filed

Jul 29, 2015

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Feb 28, 2013

Status

Dismissed

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Sep 25, 2014

Status

Pending

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Feb 21, 2006

Status

Statistical Disposition 04/05/2006

Type

Guardianship (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Mitchell L.

Filed

May 09, 2007

County

Orange County, CA

Filed

Apr 09, 2014

Status

Dismissed

County

Kern County, CA

Judge

Hon. Brumfield, Lorna H. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Brumfield, Lorna H.

Filed

Jan 22, 2014

Status

Legacy Judgment on 03/19/2014

Type

Petition for Change of Name (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Roger Ito Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Roger Ito

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

36 Files
Filed

Feb 25, 1998

Status

Closed

Type

Guardianship of Person Only

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

Filed

Sep 25, 2012

Status

Dismissed - Other 01/16/2013

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. JAN A. PLUIM Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JAN A. PLUIM

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Pasadena Courthouse

Filed

Mar 18, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

AUTO (Limited Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Jan 23, 2015

Status

Statistical Disposition 09/10/2015

Type

Dept. of Child Support Services (DCSS) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Chen Frank W. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Chen Frank W.

7 Files
Filed

May 26, 2017

Status

Closed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

Filed

Nov 01, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/29/2014

Type

Civil Rights (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

Filed

Mar 08, 2021

Status

Statistical Disposition 06/03/2021

Type

Dept. of Child Support Services (DCSS) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Chen Frank W. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Chen Frank W.

Filed

Jul 29, 2022

Status

Active

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited

Judge

Hon. S17 Unassigned

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

Filed

Jul 16, 2019

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Oct 18, 2021

Status

Statistical Disposition 12/07/2021

Type

Decedent's Estate (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Jun 18, 2010

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

1 File
Filed

Jul 29, 2014

Status

Dismissed

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. Black, Donald Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Black, Donald

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +