Cases for Guzman, Salvador in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
Filed

Jul 30, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Jun 11, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Feb 06, 2020

Status

Statistical Disposition 02/26/2020

Type

Civil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Jonathan L

Filed

Dec 09, 2019

Status

Dismissed

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. Katherine Bacal Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Katherine Bacal

Filed

Oct 17, 2019

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Judge

Hon. Benavides, Jose R. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Benavides, Jose R.

Filed

Sep 10, 2019

Status

Under Court Supervision 02/28/2020

Type

Limited Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Robert S

Filed

Oct 24, 2018

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. Scott, W. Stephen Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Scott, W. Stephen

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Oct 04, 2018

Status

Judgment - uncontested

Type

Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

May 25, 2018

Status

Active

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. Staffel, Timothy J Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Staffel, Timothy J

Filed

Jan 17, 2018

Status

Pending

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

Filed

Jan 10, 2018

Status

Open

County

Stanislaus County, CA

Filed

Sep 06, 2017

Status

Statistical Disposition 04/29/2020

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lawrence P.

Filed

Aug 11, 2017

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/10/2017

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Patricia D. Nieto Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Patricia D. Nieto

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Dec 30, 2016

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jun 08, 2016

Status

Active

County

San Mateo County, CA

21 Files
Filed

Apr 18, 2016

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Feb 01, 2016

Status

Dismissed

Type

Harassment

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jan 08, 2016

Status

Statistical Disposition 06/07/2016

Type

Petition - Custody & Support of Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Dec 07, 2015

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Oct 23, 2014

Status

Dismissed

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. Ronald S. Prager Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Ronald S. Prager

Filed

Sep 05, 2014

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Christopher K. Lui Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Christopher K. Lui

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Apr 02, 2014

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Mar 25, 2014

Status

Statistical Disposition 08/20/2014

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Mar 11, 2014

Status

Statistical Disposition 08/13/2014

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +