Cases for Guzman, Salvador in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
Filed

Jan 08, 2016

Status

Statistical Disposition 06/07/2016

Type

Petition - Custody & Support of Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Feb 04, 2009

Status

Statistical Disposition 12/21/2009

Type

Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Jul 30, 2012

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Feb 01, 2016

Status

Dismissed

Type

Harassment

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Dec 09, 2019

Status

Dismissed

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. Katherine Bacal Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Katherine Bacal

Filed

Oct 03, 2013

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Enforcement

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Oct 24, 2018

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. Scott, W. Stephen Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Scott, W. Stephen

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Mar 18, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Oct 27, 2010

Status

Dismissed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Aug 06, 2008

Status

Open 08/06/2008

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Steff

Filed

Oct 23, 2014

Status

Dismissed

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. Ronald S. Prager Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Ronald S. Prager

21 Files
Filed

Apr 18, 2016

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Dec 16, 2005

Type

Contract - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Feb 19, 2014

Status

Legacy Judgment

Type

RENEWAL JUDGMENT (Limited Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Apr 13, 2009

Status

Dismissed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Feb 02, 2009

County

Orange County, CA

Judge

Hon. Glenn Mondo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Glenn Mondo

Filed

Feb 21, 1989

Status

Open

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE

Filed

Mar 25, 2014

Status

Statistical Disposition 08/20/2014

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Jun 11, 1998

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 06, 2017

Status

Statistical Disposition 04/29/2020

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lawrence P.

Filed

Jun 30, 2006

Status

Statistical Disposition 07/24/2006

Type

DV Prevention w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Anthony

Filed

Feb 14, 2007

Status

Statistical Disposition 02/14/2007

Type

Custody Order-Juvenile-Final Judgment (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Dec 30, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 05/05/2014

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Gregory Keosian Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gregory Keosian

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +