Cases for Gardner, Adam in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-8 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Gardner, Adam"

Filed

Apr 14, 2015

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

1 File
Filed

Nov 10, 2008

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. COUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1

2 Files
Filed

Feb 09, 2009

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. COUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 2

Filed

Aug 26, 2019

Status

CLOSED

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. PYCRAFT, THOMAS

5 Files
Filed

May 17, 2022

Status

OPEN

Type

OTHER-DISCRIMINATION

County

Flagler County, FL

Judge

Hon. PERKINS, TERENCE

Filed

Oct 09, 2008

Type

FORFEITURE

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR

4 Files
Filed

Sep 29, 2015

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Foster, A. Robert

Status

OPEN

County

Marion County, FL

Judge

Hon. HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope