Cases for Fornias Iii, Edward J in Delaware

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Fornias Iii, Edward J"

Filed

Jun 13, 2014

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

May 29, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. COOCH, RICHARD R

Filed

Mar 22, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. DAVIS, ERIC M

Filed

Nov 29, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. COOCH, RICHARD R

Filed

Sep 13, 2011

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

COURT OF COMMON PLEAS JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Mar 30, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. LEGROW, ABIGAIL M

Filed

Mar 14, 2011

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Jul 11, 2011

Status

SATISFIED

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Feb 17, 2010

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Nov 01, 2010

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Mar 18, 2014

Status

BANKRUPTCY

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

Kent County, DE

Judge

Hon. WITHAM JR., WILLIAM L

Filed

Nov 30, 2010

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

May 26, 2011

Status

SATISFIED

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Jan 03, 2011

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Feb 17, 2010

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Feb 17, 2010

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Feb 17, 2010

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Nov 18, 2011

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Mar 23, 2013

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Oct 26, 2010

Status

JUDGMENT

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Aug 04, 2015

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. STREETT, DIANE CLARKE

Filed

Jun 13, 2013

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. STREETT, DIANE CLARKE

Filed

Jun 26, 2013

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. DAVIS, ERIC M

Filed

May 26, 2011

Status

SATISFIED

Type

JUSTICE OF THE PEACE JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE

Filed

Apr 14, 2015

Status

CLOSED

Type

APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANSHIP

County

New Castle County, DE

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope