Cases for Fattaruso, Paul in New York

8 Files
Filed

Dec 24, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Commercial Division

Judge

Hon. Barry R Ostrager Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Barry R Ostrager

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

117 Files
Filed

Mar 19, 2021

Status

Active

County

New York County, NY

Judge

Hon. Andrew Borrok Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Andrew Borrok

52 Files
Filed

Aug 01, 2022

Status

Active

County

New York County, NY

Judge

Hon. Melissa Anne Crane Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Melissa Anne Crane

29 Files
Filed

Sep 20, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial Division

Judge

Hon. Gretchen Walsh Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gretchen Walsh

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

23 Files
Filed

Nov 13, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78

Judge

Hon. Arthur Engoron Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Arthur Engoron

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

1503 Files
Filed

Jul 14, 2018

Status

Active

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Linda Jamieson Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Linda Jamieson

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +