Cases for Does 1 20 in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
3 Files
Filed

May 19, 2021

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

Filed

Feb 08, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Wick, Arthur A Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Wick, Arthur A

2 Files
Filed

Aug 12, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Wick, Arthur A Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Wick, Arthur A

10 Files
Filed

Feb 22, 2022

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. DeMeo, Bradford Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for DeMeo, Bradford

2 Files
Filed

Oct 14, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

Filed

Jan 02, 2020

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Wick, Arthur A Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Wick, Arthur A

4 Files
Filed

Sep 29, 2021

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

Filed

Jun 25, 2020

Status

Dismissed

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Broderick, Patrick Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Broderick, Patrick

Filed

May 19, 2021

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Broderick, Patrick Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Broderick, Patrick

Filed

Jun 15, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Broderick, Patrick Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Broderick, Patrick

15 Files
Filed

Jul 26, 2022

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Pardo, Oscar A

1 File
Filed

Aug 24, 2018

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Broderick, Patrick Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Broderick, Patrick

12 Files
Filed

Feb 03, 2022

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

Filed

Aug 12, 2021

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Broderick, Patrick Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Broderick, Patrick

5 Files
Filed

Dec 10, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Nadler, Gary Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Nadler, Gary

Filed

Apr 30, 2021

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Wick, Arthur A Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Wick, Arthur A

Filed

Oct 16, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/17/2015

Type

Othr Profes Health Care Malpractce (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Elia Weinbach Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Elia Weinbach

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

17 Files
Filed

Jun 01, 2022

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

6 Files
Filed

Oct 06, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Broderick, Patrick Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Broderick, Patrick

11 Files
Filed

Nov 29, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

Filed

Feb 11, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Serena R. Murillo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Serena R. Murillo

Filed

Aug 25, 2021

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

4 Files
Filed

Jul 14, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. DeMeo, Bradford Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for DeMeo, Bradford

Filed

Sep 15, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Judge

Hon. Dollard, Jennifer V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dollard, Jennifer V

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +