Cases for Daly Aluminum in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-5 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Daly Aluminum"

Filed

Nov 10, 2011

Status

CLOSED

Type

CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

County

Hernando County, FL

Filed

Dec 30, 2015

Type

REAL PROP - HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE2 $50,001 - $249,999

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JIROTKA, GEORGE M

Filed

Aug 25, 2015

Type

REAL PROP - HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE1 $0 - $50,000

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

Filed

Jun 11, 2008

Type

MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MINKOFF, THOMAS H

1 File
Filed

Jul 01, 2009

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope