Cases for Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc"

Filed

May 30, 2006

Status

Dismissed - Other 11/06/2006

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Jun 19, 2012

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jan 07, 2013

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jun 04, 2012

Status

Dismissed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Aug 22, 2014

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jun 12, 2014

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Oct 15, 2009

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Dec 03, 2009

Status

Dismissed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jun 30, 2008

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

May 01, 2009

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jun 24, 2011

Status

Judgment Satisfied

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Feb 03, 2012

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jul 23, 2010

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

May 01, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Feb 01, 2010

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Feb 01, 2010

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Nov 09, 2007

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

May 28, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jul 20, 2012

Status

All Proceedings Stayed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Dec 08, 2009

Status

Dismissed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Oct 24, 2008

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

May 01, 2009

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Feb 03, 2011

Status

Dismissed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Sep 24, 2012

Status

Judgment Satisfied

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Apr 18, 2013

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope