Cases for Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc in California

trellis logo loading

176-200 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc"

Filed

Sep 24, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. McLafferty, James William

Filed

Aug 17, 2007

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

May 04, 2007

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. McLafferty, James William

Filed

May 04, 2007

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Jan 18, 2007

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Aug 10, 2007

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

May 25, 2007

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Nov 02, 2007

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

May 11, 2007

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. Zel, Canter

Filed

Jun 22, 2007

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. Zel, Canter

Filed

Oct 14, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Sep 05, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Aug 10, 2012

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Aug 25, 2006

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Sep 29, 2006

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Aug 03, 2006

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Apr 07, 2006

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Sep 29, 2006

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Jun 02, 2006

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Judge

Hon. Zel, Canter

Filed

Jun 02, 2006

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Mar 06, 2015

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

May 08, 2015

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Dec 18, 2015

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Jul 13, 2012

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Mar 09, 2012

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope