Cases for Clerk Of The Circuit Court in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Clerk Of The Circuit Court"

Filed

Mar 02, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

z DO NOT USE - Legacy Mortgage Foreclosure

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Sep 29, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Nov 29, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

Challenge - Statute or Ordinance

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Jun 06, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

18 Files
Filed

Oct 27, 2014

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

1 File
Filed

Sep 25, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

Other Civil Complaint

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Dec 11, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

5 Files
Filed

Jul 10, 2015

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($0 - $50,000)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Nov 01, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Apr 13, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Dec 20, 2011

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($250,000 or more)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

May 18, 2011

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

1 File
Filed

May 15, 2015

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

May 19, 2011

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($250,000 or more)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Oct 01, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($250,000 or more)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

4 Files
Filed

Jan 09, 2013

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($250,000 or more)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Nov 09, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

3 Files
Filed

Jan 08, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Jun 02, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Non-Homestead ($250,000 or more)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Jan 31, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

5 Files
Filed

Oct 10, 2014

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

May 14, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

May 03, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

1 File
Filed

Jul 21, 2005

Status

CLOSED

Type

Other Negligence

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

Filed

Feb 16, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

RPMF -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999)

County

Miami-Dade County, FL

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope