Cases for Cervantes, Claudia in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
Filed

Nov 12, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. Matthew C. Braner Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Matthew C. Braner

Filed

Sep 20, 2017

Status

Pending

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Aug 04, 2008

Status

Open 08/04/2008

Type

Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Alan H.

Filed

Apr 19, 2011

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Nov 15, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Harassment

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jun 26, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Dec 07, 2017

Status

Stay conditional settlement

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. Loren G. Freestone Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Loren G. Freestone

Filed

Oct 03, 2012

Status

Statistical Disposition 05/20/2013

Type

Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Mark H

Filed

Sep 28, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Aug 05, 2013

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Harassment

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jul 18, 2008

Status

Statistical Disposition 09/15/2009

Type

Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Nori A

Filed

Dec 22, 2009

Status

Statistical Disposition 01/12/2010

Type

DV Prevention w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Anthony

Filed

Oct 23, 2019

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judith D. Rhodes Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Judith D. Rhodes

Filed

Nov 27, 2013

Status

Dismissed

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

San Diego County, CA

Judge

Hon. John S. Meyer Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for John S. Meyer

Filed

Mar 06, 2012

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jun 13, 2002

Status

Statistical Disposition 07/08/2002

Type

DV Prevention w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Anthony

Filed

Aug 22, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Small Claims

Judge

Hon. Sparks, Sheryle Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Sparks, Sheryle

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jul 23, 2018

Status

Dismissed

Type

Small Claims

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Apr 25, 2005

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Filed

Jul 26, 2004

Status

Judgment Entered 01/14/2005

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Filed

Jul 01, 2009

Status

Dism Lack of Prosecution-petn o/c 07/23/2009

Type

Civil Harassment (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Cowell, Michael A. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Cowell, Michael A.

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

Filed

Nov 09, 2009

Status

Judgment of Non-Suit on 12/02/2009

Type

Civil Harassment (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Falcone, Dewey L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Falcone, Dewey L.

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 27, 2022

Status

Open 07/27/2022

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Aug 18, 2005

Status

Pending

Type

Custody and Support

Judge

Hon. Unassigned

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Family Law Annex

Filed

Sep 29, 2014

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge, Assigned

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +