Cases for Cavalry Spv I, Llc in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
Filed

Nov 07, 2017

Status

JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT ENTERED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. DANIELS, D. SCOTT Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for DANIELS, D. SCOTT

Filed

Feb 02, 2015

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. MATTICE, MICHAEL Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MATTICE, MICHAEL

Filed

Nov 05, 2014

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. BEEMAN, PAUL L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BEEMAN, PAUL L.

Filed

Jan 16, 2014

Status

DISM - DISMISSED

Type

CL - Collection Case

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. BEEMAN, PAUL L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BEEMAN, PAUL L.

Filed

Nov 09, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Sep 21, 2012

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 01/04/2013

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Yvonne T. Sanchez Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Yvonne T. Sanchez

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

Filed

Feb 02, 2017

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. KAYS, SCOTT L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for KAYS, SCOTT L.

Filed

Mar 22, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Monica Bachner Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Monica Bachner

Filed

Nov 16, 2017

Status

DISMISSED - CASE DISMISSED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. GETTY, WENDY G. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for GETTY, WENDY G.

Filed

Feb 17, 2012

Status

Judgment by Court 09/13/2012

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Michele E. Flurer Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Michele E. Flurer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

Filed

Oct 19, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Melvin D. Sandvig

Filed

Apr 05, 2012

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 06/18/2012

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Jun 05, 2018

Status

JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT ENTERED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. GETTY, WENDY G. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for GETTY, WENDY G.

Filed

Mar 24, 2017

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 07/25/2017

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Jun 28, 2019

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 11/13/2019

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Melvin D. Sandvig

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

May 18, 2018

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 05/21/2019

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Melvin D. Sandvig

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

Dec 26, 2018

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 05/22/2019

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Peter A. Hernandez Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Peter A. Hernandez

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Pomona Courthouse South

Filed

Mar 05, 2012

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 07/02/2012

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Roger Ito Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Roger Ito

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 16, 2018

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 12/03/2018

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Rupert A. Byrdsong

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Oct 02, 2019

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 03/24/2020

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Melvin D. Sandvig

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

Nov 06, 2017

Status

DISMISSED - CASE DISMISSED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. JONES, ALESIA Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JONES, ALESIA

Filed

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 06/26/2019

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Deirdre Hill Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Deirdre Hill

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

Filed

Aug 01, 2013

Status

JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT ENTERED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. DANIELS, D. SCOTT Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for DANIELS, D. SCOTT

Filed

Jun 21, 2012

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 07/10/2013

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Randy Rhodes Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Randy Rhodes

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

Mar 08, 2017

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 08/04/2017

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Michael P. Vicencia Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Michael P. Vicencia

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +