Cases for Cach, Llc in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Cach, Llc"

Filed

Oct 07, 2014

Status

JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT ENTERED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. MATTICE, MICHAEL Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MATTICE, MICHAEL

Filed

Aug 15, 2013

Status

JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT ENTERED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. MATTICE, MICHAEL Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MATTICE, MICHAEL

Filed

May 10, 2017

Status

JUDGMENT - JUDGMENT ENTERED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. JONES, ALESIA Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JONES, ALESIA

Filed

Dec 17, 2014

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. MATTICE, MICHAEL Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MATTICE, MICHAEL

Filed

Feb 07, 2014

Status

DISM - DISMISSED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. BEEMAN, PAUL L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BEEMAN, PAUL L.

Filed

Aug 07, 2013

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. MATTICE, MICHAEL Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MATTICE, MICHAEL

Filed

Apr 27, 2015

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. KAYS, SCOTT L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for KAYS, SCOTT L.

Filed

Oct 21, 2016

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. KINNICUTT, HARRY S. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for KINNICUTT, HARRY S.

Filed

Jun 27, 2013

Status

DISM - DISMISSED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. MATTICE, MICHAEL Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MATTICE, MICHAEL

Filed

Feb 06, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/24/2015

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Huey P. Cotton Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Huey P. Cotton

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Jan 31, 2014

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 06/13/2014

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Oct 02, 2013

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 10/22/2014

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Huey P. Cotton Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Huey P. Cotton

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Oct 08, 2014

Status

DISM - DISMISSED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. KINNICUTT, HARRY S. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for KINNICUTT, HARRY S.

Filed

Apr 28, 2011

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 09/16/2011

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Jun 17, 2013

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 11/19/2013

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. William D. Stewart Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for William D. Stewart

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Jun 23, 2009

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 11/24/2009

Type

Breach of Rental/Lease Contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Dan Thomas Oki Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dan Thomas Oki

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Pomona Courthouse South

Filed

Dec 03, 2012

Status

Default Judgment By Clerk 06/24/2013

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. William D. Stewart Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for William D. Stewart

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Apr 15, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 02/06/2014

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Apr 28, 2017

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 11/02/2017

Type

Collections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased on or after January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Rupert A. Byrdsong

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Nov 04, 2011

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 05/24/2012

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Melvin D. Sandvig

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

May 15, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 05/13/2014

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Huey P. Cotton Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Huey P. Cotton

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Oct 21, 2016

Status

DISM - DISMISSED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. BEEMAN, PAUL L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BEEMAN, PAUL L.

Filed

Jun 27, 2013

Status

DISM - DISMISSED

Type

CB - Breach of Contract

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. BEEMAN, PAUL L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BEEMAN, PAUL L.

Filed

May 06, 2011

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 04/02/2012

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. William D. Stewart Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for William D. Stewart

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Jun 28, 2011

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 09/07/2011

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Cary Nishimoto Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Cary Nishimoto

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope