Cases for Butler, Charles E in Delaware

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Butler, Charles E"

Filed

Jan 08, 2020

Status

CLOSED

Type

INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Feb 03, 2021

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. 002349

Filed

Oct 27, 2014

Status

CLOSED

Type

DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

May 24, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

May 28, 2020

Status

NEW

Type

MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Jan 11, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

AUTO ARBITRATION APPEAL

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Feb 09, 2015

Status

CLOSED

Type

MANDAMUS

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

May 30, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

TRANSFER FROM CCP

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

1 File
Filed

Nov 10, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS (OTHER)

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Mar 11, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE BOARD

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Mar 07, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

HABEAS CORPUS

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

1 File
Filed

Dec 07, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

1 File
Filed

Jul 24, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Oct 19, 2017

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Apr 08, 2020

Status

NEW

Type

DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Jan 12, 2021

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. 002349

Filed

Oct 12, 2017

Status

CLOSED

Type

CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS (OTHER)

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Oct 17, 2018

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Apr 10, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

TRANSFER FROM CCP

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Dec 03, 2019

Status

CASE SCHEDULING ORDER

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Dec 27, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY AUTO

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

May 31, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

PROPERTY DAMAGE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Feb 08, 2017

Status

CLOSED

Type

DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Oct 13, 2014

Status

CLOSED

Type

PERSONAL INJURY

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

Filed

Jul 29, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

MORTGAGE

County

New Castle County, DE

Judge

Hon. BUTLER, CHARLES E

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope