Cases for Burritos Inc. in California

trellis logo loading

1-15 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Burritos Inc."

Filed

Mar 30, 2005

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/27/2006

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 01, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Feb 08, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Feb 03, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

May 17, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Apr 04, 2019

Status

Pending

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Laura A. Seigle Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Laura A. Seigle

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Spring Street Courthouse

Filed

Feb 17, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

2 Files
Filed

Jun 01, 2017

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Dec 21, 2016

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Jul 31, 2009

Status

Dismissed

County

Kern County, CA

Judge

Hon. Etienne, Linda S. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Etienne, Linda S.

62 Files
Filed

May 26, 2020

Type

Unlimited Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Feb 18, 2020

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Feb 08, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Dec 20, 1993

Status

Dismissed - Other 02/16/1995

Type

Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Abby Soven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Abby Soven

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope