Cases for Benson, Susan M in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Benson, Susan M"

Filed

Sep 17, 2004

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

5 Files
Filed

Nov 20, 2014

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Oct 12, 2004

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

2 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2009

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Aug 02, 2004

Type

Contract - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

1 File
Filed

Sep 06, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Jul 02, 2009

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

3 Files
Filed

Nov 16, 2006

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File
Filed

Mar 06, 2007

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Aug 08, 2005

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

1 File
Filed

Sep 24, 2019

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Mar 04, 2009

Type

Uninsured Motorist

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jun 25, 2009

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Tracy Branch

1 File
Filed

Jan 11, 2010

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File
Filed

Oct 10, 2019

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Jan 23, 2009

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 16, 2010

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Feb 28, 2011

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Feb 09, 2009

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Sep 12, 2005

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 23, 2004

Type

Misc Complaints - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 21, 2014

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

2 Files
Filed

Nov 18, 2014

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File
Filed

May 20, 2019

Type

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Dec 20, 2004

Type

Misc Complaints - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope