Cases for Belzer, Steven P in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Belzer, Steven P"

Filed

Apr 22, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Eminent Domain/ Inverse Condemnation

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Aug 21, 2007

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jun 09, 2004

Type

Eminent domain/Inverse condemnation

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Dec 31, 2014

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 07, 2009

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Dec 13, 2007

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Oct 03, 2005

Type

Misc Complaints - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jul 13, 2012

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Aug 21, 2009

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Sep 28, 2005

Type

Misc Complaints - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Sep 11, 2006

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jun 24, 2008

Type

Contract - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Dec 29, 2010

Status

Appeal

Type

Unlimited Civil Fraud

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Aug 14, 2007

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 20, 2011

Status

Conditional Settlement

Type

Unlimited Civil Eminent Domain/ Inverse Condemnation

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Aug 27, 2009

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 19, 2010

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Dec 22, 2008

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Oct 31, 2008

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Sep 28, 2005

Type

Misc Complaints - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 18, 2011

Type

Writ of Mandate

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 14, 2010

Type

Eminent domain/Inverse condemnation

County

Sacramento County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope