Cases for Bank Of San Pedro in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Bank Of San Pedro"

Filed

Apr 27, 2006

Status

Other Judgment 04/27/2006

Type

Other Enforcement of Judgment Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

Filed

Aug 18, 1993

Status

Other Judgment on 10/10/1995

Type

Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. No Assigned Judge

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 20, 1994

Status

Other Judgment on 01/18/1996

Type

Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. MASTER CALENDAR

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Pasadena Courthouse

Filed

Nov 26, 1996

Status

Judgment by Court 01/12/1998

Type

Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Valerie Baker

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 18, 1993

Status

Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. on 07/23/1996

Type

Other Real Property Rights Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. MASTER CALENDAR

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

Filed

Feb 12, 1996

Status

Judgment by Court on 09/16/1997

Type

Other Real Property Rights Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. MASTER CALENDAR

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

Filed

Dec 09, 1991

Status

Dismissed - Other 05/25/1995

Type

Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Nov 29, 1993

Status

Dismissed - Other on 01/09/1995

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 24, 1992

Status

Other Judgment on 12/06/1993

Type

Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 21, 1990

Status

Dismissed - Other 03/17/1992

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jun 13, 1994

Status

Closed

County

Yuba County, CA

Filed

Jul 09, 1992

Status

Dismissed - Other 08/25/1992

Type

Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Master Calendar

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

Filed

Mar 11, 1992

Status

Dismissed - Other on 01/26/1993

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Dec 01, 1993

Status

Dismissed - Other 02/04/1994

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

May 28, 1993

Status

Judgment by Court 12/29/1993

Type

Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jan 28, 1993

Status

Other Judgment 07/23/1993

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 04, 1993

Status

Dismissed - Other 10/07/1994

Type

Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Nov 15, 1993

Status

Other Judgment on 03/17/1994

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 17, 1992

Status

Dismissed - Other on 03/10/1994

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 07, 1993

Status

Dismissed - Other 06/08/1994

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Nov 19, 1990

Status

Other Judgment 08/28/1991

Type

Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. No Assigned Judge

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Apr 08, 1994

Status

Dismissed - Other 04/25/1994

Type

Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 30, 1992

Status

Dismissed - Other 08/11/1993

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. No Assigned Judge

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Aug 26, 1991

Status

Dismissed - Other 02/05/1992

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jun 19, 1991

Status

Other Judgment 11/13/1992

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Curtis Rappe

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope