Cases for Bank Of New York Mellon in California

trellis logo loading

26-50 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Bank Of New York Mellon"

Filed

Sep 08, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Oct 20, 2015

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 07/22/2016

Type

Mortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Oct 16, 2017

Status

Pending

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

Filed

Aug 10, 2015

Status

HEARD - HEARD

Type

DO - Complaint for Real Property

County

Solano County, CA

Filed

Apr 18, 2016

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 04/17/2017

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Pomona Courthouse South

Filed

Feb 27, 2013

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 12/18/2013

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

Apr 23, 2015

Status

VACATE - VACATED HEARING

Type

DO - Complaint for Real Property

County

Solano County, CA

Filed

Mar 02, 2017

Status

Pending

Type

Mortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Nov 22, 2019

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 06/03/2020

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

May 01, 2018

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 08/26/2020

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

Jul 13, 2018

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 01/18/2019

Type

Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Chatsworth Courthouse

Filed

Apr 28, 2014

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 01/16/2015

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

Filed

Feb 23, 2015

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 09/30/2015

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

Filed

Jan 20, 2015

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 11/07/2016

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Aug 17, 2018

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 01/23/2019

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

Filed

Jul 17, 2018

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 03/13/2019

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

Filed

Oct 10, 2018

Status

Other Clerk Judgment 10/20/2020

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

May 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/22/2016

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Nov 15, 2017

Status

Legacy Judgment 07/25/2018

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 10, 2017

Status

Pending

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

Filed

Apr 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/20/2016

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

Filed

Nov 05, 2015

Status

FINALDISP - FINAL DISPOSITION

Type

AP - Appeal

County

Solano County, CA

Filed

Jun 21, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/22/2014

Type

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Compton Courthouse

Filed

Oct 30, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/01/2015

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Torrance Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope