Cases for Abernethy, William A in Texas

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Abernethy, William A"

Filed

Nov 01, 2006

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Gonzales, Lisa

Filed

Sep 07, 2005

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Saldana, Marisela

Filed

Apr 13, 2010

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Longoria, Jose

Filed

Jan 07, 2011

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Klager, James E.

Filed

Mar 08, 2012

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Watts, Sandra L.

Filed

Jun 04, 2010

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Williams, Guy

Filed

May 25, 2005

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Hunter, Jack

Filed

Feb 10, 1995

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Westergren, Michael J.

Filed

Jan 16, 2008

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Klager, James E.

Filed

Jun 30, 2010

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Stoner, Janice K.

Filed

Jun 30, 2016

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Medary, Missy

Filed

May 12, 2010

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Vargas, Robert J.

Filed

Aug 27, 2009

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Gonzales, Lisa

Filed

Apr 30, 2004

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Watts, Sandra L.

Filed

Oct 18, 2004

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Longoria, Jose

Filed

Aug 03, 2011

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Klager, James E.

Filed

Mar 14, 2005

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Hasette, Nanette

Filed

Oct 14, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Vargas, Robert J.

Filed

Jun 04, 2014

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Hasette, Nanette

Filed

Jan 30, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Watts, Sandra L.

Filed

Aug 06, 2009

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Stith, David

Filed

May 15, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Gonzales, Lisa

Filed

Jan 19, 2017

Status

Dismissed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Galvan, Bobby

Filed

Jun 12, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Stith, David

Filed

Dec 14, 2009

Status

Disposed

County

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Hon. Vargas, Robert J.

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope