Cases for Wachovia Bank National Association in Florida

Filed

Mar 23, 2010

Status

RECLOSED

Type

Homestead Res Fcl More Than 50K Less Than 250K

County

Pasco County, FL

Judge

Hon. MANSFIELD, DECLAN P Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

13 Files
Filed

Nov 13, 2012

Status

Disposed

Type

Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Unassigned Judge

6 Files
Filed

Jun 25, 2013

Status

Disposed

Type

Non-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Brodie, Lauren L Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Brodie, Lauren L

Filed

Oct 11, 2013

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Sep 10, 2013

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

9 Files
Filed

Aug 22, 2014

Status

Disposed

Type

Other Real Property Action $0 - $50,000

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Unassigned Judge

Filed

Aug 12, 2010

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Mar 30, 2009

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

New Smyrna Beach Annex

16 Files
Filed

Nov 24, 2014

Status

CLOS

Type

REAL PROPERTY $0-$50,000 2010

County

Sarasota County, FL

Filed

Jul 30, 2008

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

May 28, 2009

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

New Smyrna Beach Annex

4 Files
Filed

Feb 23, 2015

County

Manatee County, FL

Filed

Jul 10, 2009

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

19 Files
Filed

Dec 19, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

Other-Other

County

Lake County, FL

Judge

Hon. SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J

Filed

Mar 02, 2007

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Feb 22, 2010

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Aug 07, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

Foreclosure On Real Property

County

Pasco County, FL

Filed

Apr 16, 2009

Status

RECLOSED

Type

Foreclosure On Real Property

County

Pasco County, FL

Filed

Jul 10, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

Foreclosure On Real Property

County

Pasco County, FL

Filed

Apr 01, 2008

Status

CLOSED

Type

Foreclosure On Real Property

County

Pasco County, FL

Filed

Jun 26, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

Foreclosure On Real Property

County

Pasco County, FL

Filed

Jan 12, 2010

Status

CLOSED BY DISMISSAL

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

New Smyrna Beach Annex

Filed

Apr 09, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

County

Flagler County, FL

Judge

Hon. ZAMBRANO, RAUL

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +