Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Schmidt, Carsten, Schmidt, Steffanie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Childers, Christopher Luke, against Employees 1 - 10, John & Jane Doe, Garrett, Jane Doe, Garrett, Scott, Loup Logistics Co., Union Pacific Railroad Co., (total of 6) See All represented by Wood, William Stuart Tabar, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with Brandon L. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrandon L. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Johnson, Brandon L |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Johnson, Brandon L |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Stipulated |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date May 6, 2024 at 9:30 |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Continuance | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protective Order stipulated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.